Question

How to do 15 x 3304

142

likes709 views

Timmothy

4.8

86 Answers

To multiply 15 by 3304, we can use the standard multiplication method. Here are the steps:

Step 1: Multiply the ones digit of 15 (which is 5) by 3304:

5 multiplied by 3304 is 16520 (5 × 3304 = 16520).

Step 2: Multiply the tens digit of 15 (which is 1) by 3304 and add a zero at the end:

1 multiplied by 3304 is 3304 (1 × 3304 = 3304).so after adding zero 33040

Step 3: Add the two products obtained in steps 1 and 2:

16520 + 33040 = 49560.

Answer: 15 multiplied by 3304 is 49560 (15 × 3304 = 49560).

Step 1: Multiply the ones digit of 15 (which is 5) by 3304:

5 multiplied by 3304 is 16520 (5 × 3304 = 16520).

Step 2: Multiply the tens digit of 15 (which is 1) by 3304 and add a zero at the end:

1 multiplied by 3304 is 3304 (1 × 3304 = 3304).so after adding zero 33040

Step 3: Add the two products obtained in steps 1 and 2:

16520 + 33040 = 49560.

Answer: 15 multiplied by 3304 is 49560 (15 × 3304 = 49560).

Frequently asked questions (FAQs)

What is the period of the trigonometric function f(x) = 3sin(2x) + 2cos(3x)?

+

What is the result of differentiating the composition of three functions using the Chain Rule? (

+

What is the radius of a circle with equation x^2 + y^2 = 36?

+

New questions in Mathematics